Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Campoy, Joann, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Dollard, Jennifer V presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDollard, Jennifer V Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Letters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Appointment set per 3/23/21 ex parte order, to appoint special administrator Judge: Daum, Elliot Lee |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication on Amended Notice of Hearing |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Filed | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Filing Petitioner's Supplemental Declaration Pursuant to March 23, 2021 Court Order |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Petition to Administer Estate | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application For Order Expedited Hrg | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Re: Notice Upon Ex Parte Application for Orders Declaration of Joann Campoy Re Ex Parte Notices |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Letters of Special Administration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.