Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Selleck, Michael, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Dollard, Jennifer V presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDollard, Jennifer V Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Appointment Of Conservator |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2022 |
Additional Bond $700,000.00-Suretec Insurance Company bond #$3403538 A |
||
July 18, 2022 | Notice of Entry of Order/Ruling | ||
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Account and Report Order Approving Second Account and Report of Trustee of the William Selleck Revocable Trust; Authorizing Allowance for Beneficiary/Conservatee; Authorizing and Directing Payment of Conservator/Trustee Fees and Fees for Attorneys for Conservator/Trustee; Increase Bond; and Authorizing Periodic Compensation for Conservator/Trustee |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Re: Waiver of Accounting | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Account & Report | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Proof of Service RE Petition for Approval of Second Account & Report, etc. |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Confidential Contact Info for use by Court Investigator | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Account and Report Petition for Approval of Second Account & Report of Trustee, et al. |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order/Ruling Notice of Entry of Order Approving Substituted Judgement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.