Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Emily Pierce, against Maria D. Villa Veloz, in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2020 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 12/11/2020 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: CMGT IN DEPARTMENT: D25 DROP REASON: DISMISSAL FILED ON 02/03/2020 | |
February 06, 2020 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 06/11/2020 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: D25 DROP REASON: DISMISSAL FILED ON 02/03/2020 | |
February 03, 2020 | Action | CASE DISPOSED IN ENTIRETY | |
February 03, 2020 | Action | CASE DISPOSED BEFORE TRIAL; DISMISSED - OTHER REASONS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. | |
December 18, 2019 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 12/11/2020 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: CMGT IN DEPARTMENT: D25 | |
December 18, 2019 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 06/11/2020 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: D25 | |
December 06, 2019 | Action | THIS CASE EXEMPT FROM TIME STANDARDS: LIMITED CIVIL COLLECTIONS CASE. | |
December 06, 2019 | Action | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
December 06, 2019 | Action | COMPLAINT/FIRST PAPER ACCOUNT STATED | |
December 06, 2019 | Action | FILING FEE PROCESSED: PLTF, PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC - 181.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.