Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
Kyle Quayle, filed a(n) Civil case represented by David Michael Simonini, against Nathalie Fraise, Ricardo Bayon, represented by Michael S. Burke, in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2019 | Action | JURY FEE DEPOSIT DEFT, RICARDO BAYON - 150.00 | |
December 18, 2019 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 03/02/2020 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: D14 DROP REASON: ANSWER FILED | |
December 18, 2019 | Action | FILING FEE PROCESSED: DEFT, NATHALIE FRAISE - 435.00 | |
December 18, 2019 | Action | ANSWER DEFT, NATHALIE FRAISE | |
December 18, 2019 | Action | FILING FEE PROCESSED: DEFT, RICARDO BAYON - 435.00 | |
December 18, 2019 | Action | ANSWER DEFT, RICARDO BAYON | |
December 04, 2019 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 01/30/2020 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: D14 DROP REASON: POS FILED | |
December 03, 2019 | Action | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED, AS TO: DEFT, NATHALIE FRAISE, BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/25/19. | |
December 03, 2019 | Action | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED, AS TO: DEFT, RICARDO BAYON, BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/25/19. | |
November 22, 2019 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 04/09/2020 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: CMGT IN DEPARTMENT: D14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.