Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by John E Gordon, against Wendy R. Kamin, in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2016 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 03/14/2017 AT: 08:30 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: CMGT IN DEPARTMENT: D06 DROP REASON: DISMISSAL FILED | |
September 01, 2016 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 09/12/2016 AT: 08:30 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: D06 DROP REASON: DISMISSAL FILED | |
September 01, 2016 | Action | CASE DISPOSED IN ENTIRETY | |
September 01, 2016 | Action | CASE DISPOSED BEFORE TRIAL; DISMISSED - OTHER REASONS ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
March 17, 2016 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 03/14/2017 AT: 08:30 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: CMGT IN DEPARTMENT: D06 | |
March 17, 2016 | Action | HEARING CONFIRMED FOR: 09/12/2016 AT: 08:30 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: D06 | |
March 14, 2016 | Action | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
March 14, 2016 | Action | COMPLAINT/FIRST PAPER DOES NOT EXCEED $10,000 | |
March 14, 2016 | Action | THIS CASE EXEMPT FROM TIME STANDARDS: LIMITED CIVIL COLLECTIONS CASE. | |
March 14, 2016 | Action | FILING FEE PROCESSED: PLTF, CAVALRY SPV I, LLC - 225.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.