Case Last Refreshed: 4 years ago
Joan A. Mueller, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Richard Henry Schoenberger, against Benjamin Miller Nhuch, Miguel Jacques Nhuch, represented by Guy D. Borges, in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2017 | Action | APPEARANCE DROPPED FOR 07/07/2017 AT: 09:00 AM FOR APPEARANCE TYPE: OSCH IN DEPARTMENT: D08 DROP REASON: DISMISSAL FILED | |
May 19, 2017 | Action | CASE DISPOSED IN ENTIRETY | |
May 19, 2017 | Action | CASE DISPOSED BEFORE TRIAL; DISMISSED - OTHER REASONS WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION | |
May 10, 2017 | Hearing | MINUTE ORDER POSTED - Appearance: 05/10/2017 at 9:00AM for OSC RE: DISMISSAL | |
April 14, 2017 | Action | ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE | |
April 14, 2017 | Action | ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE | |
April 14, 2017 | Hearing | MINUTE ORDER POSTED | |
April 10, 2017 | Hearing | MINUTE ORDER POSTED - Appearance: 04/10/2017 at 9:00AM for OSC RE: DISMISSAL | |
March 27, 2017 | Action | ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE | |
March 27, 2017 | Action | ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.