Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Richard Henry, against Teresa Maria Kornbeck, represented by James K Voysey, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Santa Maria - Miller - Criminal with No Assigned Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNo Assigned Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 10, 1990 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Maria - Miller - Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 1997 | Action | Pre-SUSTAIN | |
July 01, 1996 | Action | Pre-SUSTAIN | |
June 30, 1995 | Hearing |
Pre-Sustain Court Event
Judge: Rodney S Melville |
|
June 30, 1995 | Action | Pre-SUSTAIN | |
June 30, 1995 | Action | Pre-SUSTAIN | |
June 08, 1995 | Action | Pre-SUSTAIN | |
October 10, 1990 | Action | New Filed Case | |
September 11, 1990 | Action | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.