Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Santa Barbara, filed a(n) Civil case against Abdon Elenes Soto, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Santa Maria - Cook with Denise Motter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenise Motter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 26, 1990 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Maria - Cook |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2013 | Hearing |
Return on Warrant of Attachment
Judge: Denise Motter |
|
March 07, 2013 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause: Contempt
Judge: Denise Motter |
|
March 07, 2013 | Action | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 30, 2013 | Action | Warrant of Attachment, Filed | |
January 15, 2013 | Action | Proof of Non-Service | |
December 07, 2012 | Action | Warrant Recalled | |
November 29, 2012 | Hearing |
Return on Warrant of Attachment
Judge: Denise Motter |
|
November 29, 2012 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause: Contempt
Judge: Denise Motter |
|
November 29, 2012 | Action | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 26, 2012 | Action | Warrant of Attachment, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.