Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Armstrong, Kayona, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Armstrong, Dantae, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with James G. Bertoli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames G. Bertoli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order Armstrong, Dantae DOB 01/04/76; POS filed 09/10/21 Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order Armstrong, Dantae - DOB 01/04/1976 Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for DV Restraining Order | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
DV Notice of Hearing 9/21/2021 @ 1:30pm in D22 |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence without Minor Child | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Notice & Delivery of DV TRO | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order Armstrong, Dantae - EXP 9/21/2021 Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Submitted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.