Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Monterroso, Glenda, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Hackett, Marshall, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with James G. Bertoli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames G. Bertoli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order Hackett, Marshall DOB 10/15/69; POS filed 11/23/21 Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk Letter Returning Document Unfiled Electronically returned Return of Service; this action must be submitted on the proper Judicial Counsel form, I called Legal Aid and left a message with the filing attorney |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order Hackett, Marshall DOB 10/15/69 Judge: Chouteau, Rene A |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing - DV 11/30/21 @ 1:30PM S22 |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy Mailed, Returned by Post Office, No Further Address Declaration of Glenda Monterosso Mailed 8/26/2021 Returned 9/7/2021 |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
DV Notice of Hearing 09/14/21 @ 1:30PM S22 |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence without Minor Child | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Submitted Temporary Restraining Order/Notice of Court Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.