Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Urban, Jacob, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ares, Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with James G. Bertoli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames G. Bertoli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Child Custody/Visitation FCS appt 11/17/2021 Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
FCS-Child Custody Recommending Counseling
Judge: N/A, FCS |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | FCS Report | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Respondent/Mother's Family Court Services Declaration |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order For Child Custody, Visitation and Conduct Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Under UCCJEA | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk Letter Returning Document Unfiled Electronically returned Response and Declaration Under UCCJEA; Fee's due; The Response fee wasn't added by the vendor |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk Letter Returning Document Unfiled Stipulation and Order rejected electronically as First Paper Fee is due for Respondent. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.