Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lopez, Yvette G, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Hurtado, Jose Angel, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with James G. Bertoli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames G. Bertoli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJune 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order Hurtado, Jose Angel - DOB 08/02/1993 Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order Hurtado, Jose Angel - DOB 08/02/1993 Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing - DV TRO now expires: 6/14/22 |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy Mailed, Returned by Post Office, No Further Address | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order Hurtado, Jose Angel DOB 8/2/1993 Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing - DV | |
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Copy Mailed, Returned by Post Office, No Further Address Order on Request To Continue Hearing (DV-116) filed 12/07/21 mailed on 12/13/21 |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order Hurtado, Jose Angel DOB 08/02/93 Judge: Bertoli, James G |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.