Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Carbajal, Estela, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Rodriguez, Ulisses Tite, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Paul Lozada presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul Lozada Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2022 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Child Custody/Visitation Review Judge: Lozada, Paul James |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing
Judge: Lozada, Paul James |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Child Custody/Visitation POS filed 2/22/22 Judge: Lozada, Paul James |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | FCS - Tier I Mediation Report (Agreement) | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
FCS-Child Custody Recommending Counseling
Judge: N/A, FCS |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Further Order for Custody/FCS Appointment 03/09/2022 @1:15pm |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.