Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Caldwell, Aaron, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case represented by Lanz, Brian Paul, against Viratos, Robin, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with James G. Bertoli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames G. Bertoli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Restraining Order After Hearing to exp 4/6/2023 Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order Viratos, Robin DOB 06/11/65 POS Filed 3/19/2021 Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order Viratos, Robin - DOB 06/11/1965 Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Re: Notice & Delivery of DV TRO | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Temporary Restraining Order Viratos, Robin Exp 04/06/21 Judge: Bertoli, James G |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
DV Notice of Hearing 4/6/21 @ 1:30PM D22 |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence without Minor Child |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.