Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ryan Hinkins, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Walter R. Zech, Inc, against Gregg Palmer, Erin Palmer, represented by Tucker & Ricks, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Tara Reilly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTara Reilly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management142 days |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2001 |
CategoryPi Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time282 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2002 | Docket Event |
NOTICE CASE DISMISSED FILED BY ERIN PALMER, GREGG PALMER. Not Applicable |
|
October 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: DISMISSAL/FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes Pre-D Complete JUDGE: TARA REILLY CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE BAILIFF: EDDIE MCCLOUD REPORTER: MICHELLE PARSONS - ATTORNEY INFORMATION ATTORNEY GEORGE WIELAND PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PLAINTIFF PREVIOUSLY ORDERED TO APPEAR PERSONALLY OR THROUGH COUNSEL NOT PRESENT. - STAGE SET TO DISMISS DUE TO LACK OF PROSECUTION ON DEFENDANTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: LACK OF PROSECUTION. - NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY DEFENDANT. === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: JUDGE: TARA REILLY |
|
September 09, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ERIN PALMER, GREGG PALMER. Not Applicable |
|
August 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF RULING ON CMC FILED. Not Applicable |
|
August 02, 2002 | Docket Event |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Minutes Continued JUDGE: A. REX VICTOR CLERK: NANCY GRUBB REPORTER: AZIZA AHMED BAILIFF: T SMITH-HAGANS - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RYAN HINKINS ATTORNEY GEORGE WIELAND PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: ON 7/16 PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD WAS GRANTED. THE ORDER WAS SIGNED BY THIS COURT YESTERDAY. DEFENSE COUNSEL IS TO GIVE NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF (AT HIS LAST KNOWN ADDRESS) THAT PLAINTIFF MUST APPEAR FOR NEXT HEARING, EITHER PERSONALLY OR REPRESENTED BY COUNSEL. IF HE DOES NOT APPEAR, THE COURT WILL ENTERTAIN A MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT. - THE COURT GIVES NOTICE THAT THIS CASE WILL BE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE TARA REILLY FOR ALL PURPOSES EFFECTIVE 8/5/02. DEFENSE COUNSEL TO GIVE NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND FILE PROOF OF NOTICE WITH THE COURT. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL/FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 08:30 AT S20 IN DEPARTMENT === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: JUDGE: A. REX VICTOR |
|
August 01, 2002 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: AMENDED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTY FILED BY PLAINTIFF RYAN HINKINS - Minutes Pre-D Complete LEROY A SIMMONS PRESIDING. CLERK: BRONWYN MURPHY REPORTER: CRAIG ANDERSON BAILIFF: T SMITH-HAGANS - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY GLEN DUVEL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - MOTION COUNSEL SUBMITS TO TENTATIVE RULING - COURT FINDS: AMENDED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED NEW ORDER WITH FUTURE DATES USING JUDICIAL COUNSEL FORM #MC053 IS NEEDED ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: LEROY A SIMMONS PRESIDING. |
|
July 01, 2002 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: TO WITHDRAW AS PLA ATTORNEY FILED BY PLAINTIFF RYAN HINKINS VACATED |
|
June 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/01/02 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S9. Not Applicable |
|
June 14, 2002 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: AMENDED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTY FILED BY PLAINTIFF RYAN HINKINS. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.