Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The Foundation Forthe California State, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jones, Sidney W, against Portia L Craven, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management142 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2001 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions106 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time106 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 013-0024126291 Not Applicable |
|
May 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
April 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY THE FOUNDATION FORTHE CALIFORNIA STATE. Not Applicable |
|
April 11, 2002 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PORTIA L CRAVEN FILED. Not Applicable |
|
April 11, 2002 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION RE: 585;ATTY FEES FILED BY THE FOUNDATION FORTHE CALIFORNIA STATE Not Applicable |
|
April 11, 2002 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/26/2001 OF THE FOUNDATION FORTHE CALIFORNIA STATE AS TO PORTIA L CRAVEN. Not Applicable |
|
April 11, 2002 | Docket Event |
SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT. Not Applicable |
|
March 28, 2002 | Docket Event |
DFLT OF PORTIA L. CRAVEN/CLERKS JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NEEDS TO SUBMIT DECL & ORDER ALLOW CPY IN LIEU OF ORIG/CL. Not Applicable |
|
March 18, 2002 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT PACKET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): FIGUES NOT ON JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FORM PLEASE COMPLETE & RE-SUBMIT. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.