Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
William Daniel Hurford, Melissa Claypool, Philip A Claypool Ii, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Milliken, Barbara B., against Rash Engineering, Inc., Bremco Construction, Inc, Yellow Freight Systems, Inc., Yellow Corporation, represented by Unrepresented, Hosp, Gilbert, Bergsten & Phillips, Koeller, Nebeker, Carlson & Haluck, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with John P. Wade presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn P. Wade Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management142 days |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2002 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions383 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Case Cycle Time579 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2003 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: DISMISSAL VACATED |
|
July 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION FILED Not Applicable |
|
July 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: OTHER DISMISSALS AND TRANSFERS Not Applicable |
|
July 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED. Not Applicable |
|
July 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
COURT NOW RULES -- STAT CASE FOR 2C REPORT Not Applicable |
|
June 12, 2003 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PHILIP A CLAYPOOL II, MELISSA CLAYPOOL, WILLIAM DANIEL HURFORD. Not Applicable |
|
June 10, 2003 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: MEDIATION/CMC - Minutes Continued JUDGE: JOHN P. WADE CLERK: DEBORAH SIMON REPORTER: BETTY KELLEY BAILIFF: M REED - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TELEPHONED THE COURTROOM CLERK ON 6/6/03 TO STATE THAT THIS CASE IS SETTLED. BASED ON THAT, THE COURT SETS THIS CASE FOR AN OSC REGARDING DISMISSAL. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 08:30 AT S8 IN DEPARTMENT NOTICE GIVEN BY COURTROOM CLERK. === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: JUDGE: JOHN P. WADE |
|
March 25, 2003 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
March 21, 2003 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
March 04, 2003 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR GFS FILED BY YELLOW CORPORATION, YELLOW FREIGHT SYSTEMS, INC.. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.