Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jong Yeol Lee, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lo, Andrew K, against Clarice Thomas, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management142 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2001 |
CategoryPi Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions61 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time61 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
March 01, 2002 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION VACATED |
|
February 25, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED. Not Applicable |
|
February 25, 2002 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED. Not Applicable |
|
February 25, 2002 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: OTHER DISMISSALS AND TRANSFERS Not Applicable |
|
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S18 | |
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/26/2001 OF JONG LEE Not Applicable |
|
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.