Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Carmen Rojas, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Patin, C. Snyder, against Angel Demola,M.D. Inc, Clinica Medica Familiar, Daniel Sanchez Md, St. Bernardine Medical Center, represented by Carroll, Kelly, Trotter, Franzen & Mckenna, Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Martin A. Hildreth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin A. Hildreth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management144 days |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2001 |
CategoryComplaint For Medical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions270 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Cycle Time270 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2002 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS. VACATED |
|
November 14, 2002 | Docket Event |
READINESS CALENDAR VACATED |
|
October 18, 2002 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
October 15, 2002 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: FORM INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFENDANT ANGELDEMOLA,M.D. INC VACATED |
|
October 15, 2002 | Docket Event |
MOTION RE: REQ FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCS SET ONE FILED BY DEFENDANT ANGELDEMOLA,M.D. INC VACATED |
|
September 20, 2002 | Docket Event |
VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/14/02 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S5. Not Applicable |
|
September 20, 2002 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: OTHER DISMISSALS AND TRANSFERS Not Applicable |
|
September 20, 2002 | Docket Event |
VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/15/02 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S9. Not Applicable |
|
September 20, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED. Not Applicable |
|
September 20, 2002 | Docket Event |
VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/02 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S5. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.