Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sanders, James, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case against Soss, Valerie, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Nadler, Gary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNadler, Gary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryRequest For Elder Or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Order |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing Expires on 2/18/25 |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Elder or Dependent Adult Protection
Judge: Nadler, Gary |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing EA-116 |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediation Held | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Elder or Dependent Adult Protection
Judge: Nadler, Gary |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediation Services Unresolved | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Trial - Short Cause
Judge: Broderick, Patrick |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney Related Document Notice of Association |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Response | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Continue Short Cause Trial per Ex-parte |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.