Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Qawasmeh, Mohammed, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case against Hussein, Sameh, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Broderick, Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBroderick, Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryRequest For Elder Or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Order |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2022 | Notice of Entry of Order/Ruling | ||
April 04, 2022 |
Order Granted Respondent is awarded fees & costs of $6,610.00 |
||
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney's Fees
Judge: Broderick, Patrick |
|
March 30, 2022 |
Proof of Service of Filed Document Proposed order on notice of motion for attorney's fees and costs |
||
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Filed Document Re: Response |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Declaration of Petitioner |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Petitioner |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Motion/OSC mtn for attorney's fees & cost |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Joel E. Fleck ISO Notice of Motion & Motion for Attorney Fees & Costs |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Ntc of Mtn and Mtn for Attorney's Fees & Costs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.