Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The Petaluma People Services Center, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Brown, Kari Jill, against Mcentee, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Wheeldin, Anthony presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWheeldin, Anthony Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Workplace Violence Restraining Orders |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2021 |
Restraining Order After Hearing Expires on May 11, 2026 |
||
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Workplace Violence Protective Order Continued from 5/4/21 due to technical issues Judge: Wheeldin, Anthony |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation to Commissioner
Judge: Wheeldin, Anthony |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Mediation Services Unresolved | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Workplace Violence Protective Order
Judge: Wheeldin, Anthony |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Mediation Held | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Restraining Order as of: | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause WV Notice of Court Hearing |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Wheeldin, Anthony |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.