Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lindeman, Erika, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Mendenhall, John Ross, represented by Levy, Julie S, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Wheeldin, Anthony presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWheeldin, Anthony Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryRequest For Civil Harassment Restraining Orders |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment Continued from 5/4/21. Set on EP calendar due to Comm. Recusal Continued from 5/21/21. Set on EP calendar due to Comm. Recusal Judge: Lozada, Paul James |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Settlement Agreement | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Lozada, Paul James |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Wheeldin, Anthony |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing Expire on *7/9/2021* |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Court Date Request to Continue Hearing |
|
May 04, 2021 |
170.1 Judge Recuses Self
Judge: Wheeldin, Anthony |
||
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Harassment
Judge: Wheeldin, Anthony |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge Recuses Self Per 170.1 CCP
Judge: Wheeldin, Anthony |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.