Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Christiansen, Michelle, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Redwood Credit Union, represented by Vanzandt, Peter James, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Broderick, Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBroderick, Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2022 |
Jury Trial
Judge: Broderick, Patrick |
||
January 27, 2022 | Dismissal With Prejudice - Entire Action | ||
January 26, 2022 | Reinstatement of Proceedings | ||
October 25, 2021 | Unconditional Notice of Settlement Entire | ||
August 27, 2021 | Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial | ||
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Broderick, Patrick |
|
July 12, 2021 | Case Management Statement | ||
May 19, 2021 | Answer | ||
May 03, 2021 |
Proof of Service of Process Personal |
||
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.