Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lamar Peckham, Individually And Derivatively On Behalf Of Peckham & Daughter, P., filed a(n) Business Governance - Securities case against Leon, Sara, Leon, Sarah, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Nadler, Gary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNadler, Gary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
Category21: Unlimited Partnership And Corp Gov |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaSecurities |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeBusiness Governance |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2021 |
Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction.. per 8/11 Order Judge: Nadler, Gary |
||
September 14, 2021 | Dismissal With Prejudice - Entire Action | ||
August 31, 2021 | Answer | ||
August 12, 2021 |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Nadler, Gary |
||
August 11, 2021 |
Stipulation & Order for: reset OSC hearing |
||
August 09, 2021 | Declaration Re Meet & Confer | ||
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Nadler, Gary |
|
July 28, 2021 |
Case Management Statement LATE |
||
July 14, 2021 | Case Management Statement | ||
July 14, 2021 |
Order Denied STIPULATION & ORDER TO SET ASIDE & RESET OSC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.