Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ryan, Jereome, Ryan, Naomi, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Grossman, Evangeline Fisher, Kabateck, Brian Stephen, Scott, Peter David, against Schmitt, Wendy, State Farm General Insurance Company, represented by Stone, Sandra Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with DeMeo, Bradford presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeMeo, Bradford Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
Category18: Unlimited Insurance Coverage |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Substitution of Attorney - PS Out
Date: March 14, 2022Proposed Order Coversheet
Date: July 19, 2022Ryan POS re Ex Parte to Continue Trial
Date: July 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 10 days Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ryan1_220926160521_0001 | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ryan1_220819131418_0001 | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney Related Document Association of Counsel |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Order re Trial Date | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order/Ruling Continuing Trial Date |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Coversheet | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Ryan POS re Ex Parte to Continue Trial | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Stipulation for Trial Continuance | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granted Exparte order to continue trial date: copy emailed to submitting party. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.