Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Koran, Jason, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hall, Johann A, against Grinsell, Diane, represented by Swenson, Richard Augustus, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Wick, Arthur A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWick, Arthur A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2020 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 5-7 days Judge: Wick, Arthur A |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Trial Only |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Wick, Arthur A |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement LATE |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees/Demand for Jury | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Process Personal Service |
|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued | |
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.