Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Zitrin, Elizabeth A, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mastromonaco, Leonard Peter, against Hough, Charles, Tyler, Janice, represented by Lewis, Scott Adrian, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with DeMeo, Bradford presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeMeo, Bradford Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2019 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
2024 01 24 Def's CMS
Date: January 24, 20242022 03 04 Answer to FAC
Date: March 05, 202271579ExPar010c50
Date: February 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Set via stip & order of 11/27 Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024 01 24 Def's CMS | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 3-4 days. Cont. per XP request from 3/17/23 to 12/1/23. Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order Vacating Trial and Setting for CMC |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 3-4 days Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial *AMENDED* |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance of Trial |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: DeMeo, Bradford |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | 71579ExPar010c50 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.