Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The People Of The State Of Ca, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case represented by District Attorney, against Brizuela, Jose Toribio, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Troye K. Shaffer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTroye K. Shaffer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryMental Competency - Pc 1368 |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
To Reset 1372 PC competency restoration hearing Judge: Shaffer, Troye K. |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
PC 1372 Restoration of Mental Competency
Judge: Shaffer, Troye K. |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
PC 1372 Restoration of Mental Competency
Judge: Shaffer, Troye K. |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
PC 1372 Restoration of Mental Competency 1 hour Judge: Behnke, John |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
To Set 1372 Hearing Judge: Shaffer, Troye K. |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
PC 1372 Restoration of Mental Competency
Judge: Shaffer, Troye K. |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
PC 1372 Restoration of Mental Competency
Judge: Shaffer, Troye K. |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report Received - Confidential PC1372 Court Report dated 8/15/2022- JBCT Program |
|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus Hearing
Judge: Honigsberg, Christopher M. |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Habeas Petitions as Moot |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.