Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
People Of The State Of Ca, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case against Brown, Sebastian Mallory, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with English, Kenneth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEnglish, Kenneth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryMental Competency - Pc 1368 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Control
Judge: English, Kenneth G. |
|
August 13, 2021 |
Report
Judge: English, Kenneth G. |
||
August 13, 2021 | Criminal Proceedings Reinstated | ||
August 13, 2021 | Defendant found mentally competent | ||
August 12, 2021 |
Report Received - Confidential WELLPATH_JBCT |
||
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report
Judge: English, Kenneth G. |
|
August 04, 2021 |
Refer to Mental Health JBCT |
||
August 03, 2021 |
Report Received - Confidential JBCT Progress Report |
||
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review
Judge: English, Kenneth G. |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Refer to Mental Health JBCT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.