Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Of California, Employment Development, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Employment Development Department, against Mary L Burnett, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2001 |
CategoryCertificate For Summary Judgment (Edd) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions2476 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED Not Applicable |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,025.47 Not Applicable |
|
March 11, 2003 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO YOLO COUNTY ( * ) Not Applicable |
|
March 07, 2003 | Docket Event |
MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED. Not Applicable |
|
January 03, 2002 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
December 28, 2001 | Docket Event |
COURT NOW RULES -- STAT CASE FOR 2C REPORT Not Applicable |
|
December 28, 2001 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL. Not Applicable |
|
December 28, 2001 | Docket Event |
PETITION FILED (CIVIL) Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.