Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mann Bracken, Llp, against Patricia Cronin, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management144 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2001 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions37 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time37 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
March 08, 2002 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION VACATED |
|
February 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED. Not Applicable |
|
February 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED. Not Applicable |
|
February 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: OTHER DISMISSALS AND TRANSFERS Not Applicable |
|
January 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PATRICIA CRONIN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/13/02 Not Applicable |
|
January 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/08/02 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S2. Not Applicable |
|
December 31, 2001 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/31/2001 OF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK Not Applicable |
|
December 31, 2001 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S2 | |
December 31, 2001 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.