Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Comp, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Keith L. Shoji & Associates, against Rosalyn Brown, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Frank J. Gafkowski presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank J. Gafkowski Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management144 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2001 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage/Subrogation (Ltd) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions65 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Case Cycle Time161 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2003 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. Not Applicable |
|
June 09, 2003 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF CYNTHIA MARTINEZ &ASSOCIATES FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP CHANGES ITS NAME TO KEITH L. SHOJI & ASSOCIATES FILED Not Applicable |
|
June 03, 2003 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
May 05, 2003 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED RE: TO ACCEPT SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BY PAYMENTS. Not Applicable |
|
May 01, 2003 | Docket Event |
CASE SENT TO S6 FOR REV/SIGN ON STIP AND ORDER TO ACCEPT PAYMENTS Not Applicable |
|
March 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
January 08, 2003 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
January 08, 2003 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF FACTS ISSUED: UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT Not Applicable |
|
August 30, 2002 | Docket Event |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
July 21, 2002 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JDGMNT FILED BY STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.