Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Monogram Credit Card Bank Of Georgia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Edgar J Lana, against Antonia Valtierra, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management147 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2001 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions82 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time95 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. Not Applicable |
|
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00. Not Applicable |
|
December 03, 2004 | Docket Event |
WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM RIVERSIDE COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $0.00. Not Applicable |
|
November 01, 2004 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( * ) | |
October 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED. Not Applicable |
|
May 24, 2004 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY ( * ) | |
May 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED. Not Applicable |
|
June 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED Not Applicable |
|
May 24, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
April 02, 2002 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF RE:POINTS & AUTH.SUPT.SUPP.DEC.JDGT FILED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.