Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Juan Alarcon, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Edward G. Operini, against Rosario Becerra, Juan Roberto Becerra, represented by Unrepresented, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with James A. Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames A. Edwards Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2001 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract(Ltd) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions110 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time252 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
COURT TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HRS. VACATED |
|
September 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED. Not Applicable |
|
September 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED. Not Applicable |
|
September 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: OTHER DISMISSALS AND TRANSFERS Not Applicable |
|
August 07, 2002 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONTNCE OF TRIAL FILED BY JUAN ALARCON. Not Applicable |
|
July 26, 2002 | Docket Event |
COURT TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HRS. - Minutes Continued JUDGE: JAMES A. EDWARDS CLERK: SUSAN MALMBERG REPORTER: KATHY BLYTHE BAILIFF: MIKE CAPES - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY OPERINI BY TELEPHONE ON 7-25-02 PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JUAN ROBERTO BECERRA, ROSARIO BECERRA - PROCEEDINGS: ATTY OPERINI ADVISES THE DEFENDANTS HAVE FILED BANKRUPTCY, THEREFORE, IS AWAITING RECEIPT THEREOF. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/04/02 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S15. NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY PLAINTIFF. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === Judge: JUDGE: JAMES A. EDWARDS |
|
June 18, 2002 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY JUAN ROBERTO BECERRA Not Applicable |
|
June 18, 2002 | Docket Event |
UPDATE DISPOSITION OF JUAN ROBERTO BECERRA TO BANKRUPT. Not Applicable |
|
May 22, 2002 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE FILED BY JUAN ALARCON. Not Applicable |
|
May 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.