Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
First Resolution Investment Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by George L Cohn, against Orlando Valderrama, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management144 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2001 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions35 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time35 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED |
|
March 01, 2002 | Docket Event |
OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION VACATED |
|
February 21, 2002 | Docket Event |
FEE PAYMENT Not Applicable |
|
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED. Not Applicable |
|
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event |
STAGE AT DISPOSITION: OTHER DISMISSALS AND TRANSFERS Not Applicable |
|
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event |
CASE ORDERED DISMISSED W/OUT PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED. Not Applicable |
|
January 11, 2002 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ORLANDO VALDERRAMA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/03/02 Not Applicable |
|
January 11, 2002 | Docket Event |
VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/01/02 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S5. Not Applicable |
|
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT Not Applicable |
|
December 24, 2001 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.