Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Haines, Barbara, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Verges, Joe, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wolk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wolk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Lodged Document EXHIBITS RECEIVED BY DEFENDANT AT COUNTER; SENT TO COURTROOM CLERK |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Minute Order *Trial: Court Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COMMISSIONER HOHENWARTER FOR REVIEW OF ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Lodged Document EVIDENCE BY PETITIONER |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER; FILED BY DEFENDANT JOSEPH VERCHES |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.