Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ovanesian, Victoria filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Abdeltawab, Sara, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wolk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wolk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2020 |
CategoryAppeal: Small Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filed AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR JAMES A SMITH FOR DEFENDANT VICTORIA OVANESIAN |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial de Novo
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order ON REQUEST FOR POSTPONE TRIAL |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To ORDER ON REQ TO POSTPONE TO JUDGE WOLK |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Req for Postponement of Hearing after service (SC) | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service BY MAIL- TO SARA ABDELTAWAB ON 1/5/2021 |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRAIL AS TO VICTORIA OVANESIAN |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial de Novo
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Received DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS. GIVEN TO JENNIFER G |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granted ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL; FILED BY VICTORIA OVANESIAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.