Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bakhshpour, Justin Pedram, Bakhshpour, Kevin, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Landmark Properties, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Hohenwarter, Catherine presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHohenwarter, Catherine Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Hohenwarter, Catherine |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed LANDMARK PROPERTIES SMALL CLAIMS BRIEF |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Lodged Document PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS SENT TO CAL SHELF |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Hohenwarter, Catherine |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition Guide & File SC-100 Small Claims Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.