Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Visioneering Studios Construction Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Albrecht Scott, Pieter Anat, Mayer Danielle, Mayer Danielle Michelle, against Cedarwood Capital Partners La Cienega Llc, Encompass Construction Corporation, Henderson Engineers Inc., Nxt Studios Inc, represented by Chao Louis R, Dacey John P, Dalmore Jean Ann, Eum Margaret Na Young, Platt Anthony Damon, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Lisa Hart Cole presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa Hart Cole Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 19, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: March 19, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens ((Recorded))
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT )
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of )
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Related Case Filed o...))
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Related Case Filed o...) of )
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00STIPULATION TO STAY INSTANT ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF BINDING ARBITRATION
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference and Status Conference)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice (of: (1) Court's Minute Order Re: Related case; and (2) Notice of Case reassignment)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Notice (of Minute Order)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re: Arbitration))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00[PROPOSED] ORDER ON STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF BINDING ARBITRATION
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re: Arbitration))
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition by Troxy Enterprises, Inc. DBA K&B Electic to OSC Re Related Cases)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Notice of Related Case Filed o...) of )
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re: Arbitration))
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to OSC Re Related Case)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order re Notice of Related Cases)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Cases Listed in the Notice of...))
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Notice of Related Case Filed o...))
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice (of Court's Minute Order re: Further Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to OSC Re Related Case)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Cases Listed in the Notice of...))
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Related Case Filed o...))
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice (of: (1) Court's Minute Order Re: Related case; and (2) Notice of Case reassignment)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/05/2018)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Notice (of Minute Order)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Notice (of Court's Minute Order re: Further Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition by Troxy Enterprises, Inc. DBA K&B Electic to OSC Re Related Cases)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens ((Recorded))
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00[PROPOSED] ORDER ON STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF BINDING ARBITRATION
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re: Arbitration))
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order re Notice of Related Cases)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT )
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Notice of Related Case Filed o...))
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.