Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wohl James P., filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case against Lee Victor, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Nancy L. Newman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNancy L. Newman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2018 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time368 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: JAMES P. WOHL (Plaintiff); As to: VICTOR LEE (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: JAMES P. WOHL (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Default entered as to VICTOR LEE; On the Complaint filed by JAMES P. WOHL on
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: JAMES P. WOHL (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by JAMES P. WOHL on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: September 20, 2019Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 20, 2019Order JUDGMENT; Signed and Filed by: JAMES P. WOHL (Plaintiff); As to: VICTOR LEE (Defendant)
Date: September 20, 2019Notice of Ruling; Filed by: JAMES P. WOHL (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Default) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Order (JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Declaration (of James P Wohl in Support of Request for Relief from Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Order (ORDER TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice])
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT )
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Default))
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT AND JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 03/25/2019)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (does 1-20)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal))
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: re: Default) of 07/18/2019)
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: plaintiff's failure to appear))
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.