Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ruiz, Elizabeth, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Aprp Llc, New Bridge Management, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Beeson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeeson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryIndividual Small Claims: $1,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Non-Settlement - Negotiation (ODR)
Date: February 16, 2021Plaintiff's Claim & Order to Defendant
Date: January 06, 2021Small Claims Hearing
Date: February 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Master SC Minute Order Small Claims Hearing Judge: Beeson, Jared |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Master SC Minute Order Small Claims Hearing Judge: Beeson, Jared |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Small Claims Mediation Held | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Master SC Minute Order Small Claims Hearing Judge: Beeson, Jared |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Settlement Agreement - Negotiation (ODR) Non-Settlement - Negotiation (ODR) |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant Plaintiff's Claim & Order to Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.