Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Monarrez, Mercy, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Biagi, Felicia, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Beeson, Jared presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeeson, Jared Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryIndividual Small Claims: $0 - $1,500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Non-Settlement - Negotiation (ODR)
Date: February 16, 2021Defendant's Claim & Order to Plaintiff $1,501 to $5,000
Date: February 08, 2021Request for Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: February 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beeson, Jared |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Settlement Agreement - Negotiation (ODR) Non-Settlement - Negotiation (ODR) |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Claim & Order to Plaintiff $1,501 to $5,000 | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim & Order to Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.