Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dematteo, Domenick John, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Al-Mashat, Abdul Jabbar, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time32 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: ABDUL JABBAR AL-MASHAT ON 06/17/2020; DOCUMENTS SERVED ARE NOT STATED |
|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.