Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jensen, Charles R, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Ford, Jermaine, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReed, David W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time258 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: SERVED: JERMAINE FORD "NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE" ON 8-5-08 BY MAIL. |
|
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF. |
|
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Referral to Mediator/Investigator REF TO MEDIATION |
|
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL REFEREE REED CLERK NAVARRETTE PLAINTIFF APPEARING DEFENDANT APPEARING MEDIATION AGREEMENT FILED. NO JUDGMENT ENTERED IF SUCCESSFULLY COMPLETED Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Returned DECL OF NON SERVICE Notes: DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE; 3 attempts made by Robert Davis. ///skb |
|
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: Declaration of Diligence filed by Robert Davis. ///sk b | |
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation MEDIATION AGRM FILED |
|
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: jermaine Ford by personal service on 2/4/08 b y Robert Davis. Fee for service: $30.00. ///skb |
|
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed CERT LTR RET REF/UNC Notes: REFUSED/UNCLAIMED: ADDRESSED TO: JERMAINE FORD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.