Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yolo Federal Credi, T Union, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Lachappelle, Lindy L, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 24, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
December 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
December 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
|
November 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: LINDY L. LACHAPPELLE ON 10-27-06 BY PERSONAL SERVICE. FEE: $75.00. |
|
October 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.