Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yolo Federal Credi, T Union, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Tenenbaum, Jay M, against Munoz, Annett, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time55 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE* Notes: RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE. | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | ISSUED* Notes: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT. | |
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application for & Renewal of Judgment (EJ-190) APP RENEWAL/JUD Notes: APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. |
|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: CREDIT: $146.00, INTEREST: $292.53 |
|
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT WHOLLY UNSATSFD Notes: WRIT FILED WHOLLY UNSATISIFIED. |
|
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT FILED* Notes: ISSUED LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON 7-14-11. |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: MEMO OF COSTS: -0-; CREDITS: -0-; INTEREST: $160.29. |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event | FILED* Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY | |
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECLARATION REGARDING INTEREST CALCULATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.