Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ashley, Jesse A, Aubrey, Jodi L, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Walker, Harry, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2003 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions4146 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time4150 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION | |
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES CASE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
March 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLKS CERT OF MAIL |
|
January 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
December 09, 2003 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.