Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jensen, Charles R, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Barrett, Richard, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Beronio, Janene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeronio, Janene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 1999 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APPEARANCES CASE DISMISSED - LACK OF PROSECUTION Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER* | |
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: DISMISSING CASE FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION OF ACTION | |
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
March 18, 1999 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL 3-18-99 AT REQUEST OF: Court no appearances, no service Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
February 09, 1999 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed CERT LTR RET REF/UNC Notes: REFUSED/UNCLAIMED RICHARD BARRETT |
|
February 04, 1999 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CERT MAIL SENT* Notes: CERTIFIED MAIL #P 595 160 656 MAILED 2/4/99 TO RICHARD BARRETT, WITH PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT. |
|
February 02, 1999 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim CLM OF PLTFF-SM CLMSAction: ACT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.