Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shafiee, Moe, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Lucas, Earl, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 1998 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event | PURGE AND DESTROY Notes: PURGE AND DESTROY | |
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER* Notes: Delay in Prosecution | |
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss NO APP ORDER DISMISSING SIGNED AND FILED IN OPEN CRT Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned RETURNED MAIL Notes: RTM 4-9-12 |
|
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC MTN DISM LACK PR Notes: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION |
|
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing CLK'S CERT OF MAIL |
|
February 18, 1999 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL 2-18-99 DROPPED FROM CALENDER, NO SERVICE, PLAINTIFF REFERRED TO RM103 Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
January 07, 1999 | Docket Event |
Minute Comment DROPPED FR CALENDAR Notes: AT REQUEST OF: PLAINTIFF, NO SERVICE |
|
January 07, 1999 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL Judge: Judge, Assigned |
|
November 30, 1998 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notes ADDED TO SYSTEM* Notes: MANUALLY FROM PSI/CD-ROM/PAPER DOCKETS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.